THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:55:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 William Graham Drive
Aurora Ontario L4G 3G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-841-8118
Fax: 905-868-8659
Address: 7 - 47 Harry Walker Parkway South
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8T8
Phone: 289-841-8118
Fax: 905-868-8659

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trisha Jaeeun Min Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Min (CPSO#: 103299 )
Business Address: Wellmedica
Suite 55
7600 Weston Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8B7
(855) 371-3500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 William Graham Drive
Aurora Ontario L4G 3G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-841-8118
Fax: 905-868-8659
Address: 7 - 47 Harry Walker Parkway South
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8T8
Phone: 289-841-8118
Fax: 905-868-8659

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trisha Jaeeun Min Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Min (CPSO#: 103299 )
Business Address: Wellmedica
Suite 55
7600 Weston Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8B7
(855) 371-3500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRISHA JAEEUN MIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRISHA JAEEUN MIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014