THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:34:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesia
365 West Street
Simcoe, Ontario
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. H. Roukema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Roukema (CPSO#: 103307 )
Business Address: Department of Anesthesia
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
(226) 236-4030
Business Address: 75 Parkview Road
Hagersville Ontario N0A 1H0
Business Address: Woodstock Hospital
Anesthesia
226-236-4030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesia
365 West Street
Simcoe, Ontario
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. H. Roukema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Roukema (CPSO#: 103307 )
Business Address: Department of Anesthesia
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
(226) 236-4030
Business Address: 75 Parkview Road
Hagersville Ontario N0A 1H0
Business Address: Woodstock Hospital
Anesthesia
226-236-4030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID HENRY ROUKEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUKEMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID HENRY ROUKEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUKEMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014