THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 02:59:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
RM 1NW-126
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 756 6165
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gil Yehudaiff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Yehudaiff (CPSO#: 103310 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
North York Ontario M3M 3G7
(416) 242-1000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
RM 1NW-126
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 756 6165
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gil Yehudaiff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Yehudaiff (CPSO#: 103310 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
North York Ontario M3M 3G7
(416) 242-1000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIL YEHUDAIFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEHUDAIFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIL YEHUDAIFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEHUDAIFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014