THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:06:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 372 Lacroix Street
Unit B
Chatham Ontario N7M 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193551555
Fax: 5194800383

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alisha Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fernandes (CPSO#: 103313 )
Business Address: B-146 Queen St
Chatham ON N7M 2G6
519-355-1555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 372 Lacroix Street
Unit B
Chatham Ontario N7M 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193551555
Fax: 5194800383

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alisha Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fernandes (CPSO#: 103313 )
Business Address: B-146 Queen St
Chatham ON N7M 2G6
519-355-1555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISHA REBECCA FERNANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISHA REBECCA FERNANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014