THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:42:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: Cortel, Miguel Alejandro (Used Until: 25 Jun 2019)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2451 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7X7
Phone: (613) 668-0360
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. A. CORTEL-LEBLANC MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cortel-LeBlanc (CPSO#: 103342 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
613.721.2000

General Information

Former Name: Cortel, Miguel Alejandro (Used Until: 25 Jun 2019)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2451 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7X7
Phone: (613) 668-0360
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. A. CORTEL-LEBLANC MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cortel-LeBlanc (CPSO#: 103342 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
613.721.2000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIGUEL ALEJANDRO CORTEL-LEBLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORTEL-LEBLANC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIGUEL ALEJANDRO CORTEL-LEBLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORTEL-LEBLANC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014