THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 02:11:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sexual Health Centre
179 Clarence St.
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 234-4641
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3V4
Phone: 613-686-3378
Fax: 613-225-9736
Address: Origyns Medical
1355 Bank St
Suite 205
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 721-2907
Fax: 613-518-6555

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Devitt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Devitt (CPSO#: 103348 )
Business Address: Origyns Medical
205-1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 721-2907
Business Address: 179 Clarence Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1B3
Business Address: 1385 Woodroffe Ave Ottawa
Health Services, Room C141
Algonquin College ON K2G 1V8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sexual Health Centre
179 Clarence St.
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 234-4641
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3V4
Phone: 613-686-3378
Fax: 613-225-9736
Address: Origyns Medical
1355 Bank St
Suite 205
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 721-2907
Fax: 613-518-6555

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Devitt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Devitt (CPSO#: 103348 )
Business Address: Origyns Medical
205-1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 721-2907
Business Address: 179 Clarence Street
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1B3
Business Address: 1385 Woodroffe Ave Ottawa
Health Services, Room C141
Algonquin College ON K2G 1V8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY PAIGE DEVITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVITT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY PAIGE DEVITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVITT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014