THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:48:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 545 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-633-2345
Fax: 416-633-2216
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Health Network
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuel Direnfeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Direnfeld (CPSO#: 103356 )
Business Address: 2175 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 304
Toronto Ontario M2J 1W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 545 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-633-2345
Fax: 416-633-2216
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Health Network
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuel Direnfeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Direnfeld (CPSO#: 103356 )
Business Address: 2175 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 304
Toronto Ontario M2J 1W8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL MARK DIRENFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIRENFELD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL MARK DIRENFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIRENFELD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014