THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:30:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14-2800 Skymark Ave
Mississauga ON L4W 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-497-8747
Fax: 1-866-852-0128

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.T. MAZUREK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mazurek (CPSO#: 103382 )
Business Address: 14-2800 Skymark Ave
Mississauga ON L4W 5A6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14-2800 Skymark Ave
Mississauga ON L4W 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-497-8747
Fax: 1-866-852-0128

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.T. MAZUREK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mazurek (CPSO#: 103382 )
Business Address: 14-2800 Skymark Ave
Mississauga ON L4W 5A6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW THOMAS MAZUREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZUREK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW THOMAS MAZUREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZUREK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014