THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:19:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Health
89 Norman St
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Extension: 8532
Fax: 519-464-4544

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amanda M Giffin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Giffin (CPSO#: 103391 )
Business Address: 89 Norman St
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
5194644400 Extn: 8532

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Health
89 Norman St
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Extension: 8532
Fax: 519-464-4544

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amanda M Giffin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Giffin (CPSO#: 103391 )
Business Address: 89 Norman St
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
5194644400 Extn: 8532

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA MARY GIFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIFFIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA MARY GIFFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIFFIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 May 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 May 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 May 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 May 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014