THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:22:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Woodlawn Ave
Mississauga ON L5G 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052733176
Fax: 9058481500
Address: 612 Mount Pleasant Road
Hardy Terrace Long-Term Care Home
Brantford Ontario N0E 1K0
Phone: (519) 484-2431
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Shalom Village Long Term Care
70 Macklin Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8S3S1
Phone: 9055291613
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M0L8
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fady Akladios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Akladios (CPSO#: 103397 )
Business Address: Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: 70 Macklin Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8S 3S1
(905) 529-1613
Business Address: Suite 500
71 King Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Woodlawn Ave
Mississauga ON L5G 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052733176
Fax: 9058481500
Address: 612 Mount Pleasant Road
Hardy Terrace Long-Term Care Home
Brantford Ontario N0E 1K0
Phone: (519) 484-2431
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Shalom Village Long Term Care
70 Macklin Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8S3S1
Phone: 9055291613
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M0L8
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fady Akladios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Akladios (CPSO#: 103397 )
Business Address: Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: 70 Macklin Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8S 3S1
(905) 529-1613
Business Address: Suite 500
71 King Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FADY AKLADIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKLADIOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FADY AKLADIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKLADIOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014