THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:05:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Copper Creek Drive
Unit 100
Markham Stouffville Urgent Care Centre
Markham Ontario L6B 0P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-8911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Dusk Drive
Pulse Urgent Care Centre
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5Z6
Phone: (905) 451-9999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2404 Eglinton Avenue West
Westside Walk In Clinic
Toronto Ontario M6M 1S6
Phone: (416) 410-0505
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.B. Sharifian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sharifian (CPSO#: 103402 )
Business Address: Suite 100
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
(905) 472-8911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Copper Creek Drive
Unit 100
Markham Stouffville Urgent Care Centre
Markham Ontario L6B 0P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-8911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Dusk Drive
Pulse Urgent Care Centre
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5Z6
Phone: (905) 451-9999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2404 Eglinton Avenue West
Westside Walk In Clinic
Toronto Ontario M6M 1S6
Phone: (416) 410-0505
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.B. Sharifian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sharifian (CPSO#: 103402 )
Business Address: Suite 100
110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
(905) 472-8911

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
20 Mar 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 20 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from March 20, 2025, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Babak Sharifian in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sharifian to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. BABAK SHARIFIAN
(“Dr. Sharifian”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE
(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
“IEP” means Individualized Education Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
(2) I, Dr. Sharifian, certificate of registration number 103402, am a member of the College.
(3) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-439004-D3V8Y5 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family medicine practice.

B. UNDERTAKING
(4) I, Dr. Sharifian, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(5) Professional Education
(a) I, Dr. Sharifian, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “A”, including all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):
(i) Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:
1. Vaccine Storage and Handling Guidelines, 2021 (Ontario);
(ii) Review of the following practice tool:
1. Immunization in practice: a practical guide for health staff, 2015 update. Module 2: The vaccine cold chain (WHO);
(iii) Individualized instruction in professionalism and ethics satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the College;
(iv) Review, reflection, and discussion with the instructor conducting my individualized instruction of the following policies and other self-study:
1. Essentials of Medical Professionalism, College policy.
(b) I, Dr. Sharifian, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.
(c) I, Dr. Sharifian, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.
(d) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.
(e) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that if any of the self-study resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.
(6) Monitoring
(a) I, Dr. Sharifian, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(7) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(8) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(9) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(10) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
(11) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.
(12) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sharifian engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Sharifian will engage in professional education in maintaining an effective vaccine cold chain, complying with Public Health orders, and cooperating with Public Health inspectors.
(c) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT
(14) I, Dr. Sharifian, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:
(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and
(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(15) I, Dr. Sharifian, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(16) I, Dr. Sharifian, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(b) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;
(c) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from March 20, 2025, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Babak Sharifian in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sharifian to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. BABAK SHARIFIAN
(“Dr. Sharifian”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE
(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
“IEP” means Individualized Education Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
(2) I, Dr. Sharifian, certificate of registration number 103402, am a member of the College.
(3) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-439004-D3V8Y5 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family medicine practice.

B. UNDERTAKING
(4) I, Dr. Sharifian, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(5) Professional Education
(a) I, Dr. Sharifian, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “A”, including all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):
(i) Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:
1. Vaccine Storage and Handling Guidelines, 2021 (Ontario);
(ii) Review of the following practice tool:
1. Immunization in practice: a practical guide for health staff, 2015 update. Module 2: The vaccine cold chain (WHO);
(iii) Individualized instruction in professionalism and ethics satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the College;
(iv) Review, reflection, and discussion with the instructor conducting my individualized instruction of the following policies and other self-study:
1. Essentials of Medical Professionalism, College policy.
(b) I, Dr. Sharifian, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.
(c) I, Dr. Sharifian, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.
(d) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.
(e) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that if any of the self-study resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.
(6) Monitoring
(a) I, Dr. Sharifian, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(7) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(8) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(9) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(10) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
(11) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.
(12) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sharifian engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Sharifian will engage in professional education in maintaining an effective vaccine cold chain, complying with Public Health orders, and cooperating with Public Health inspectors.
(c) I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT
(14) I, Dr. Sharifian, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:
(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and
(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(15) I, Dr. Sharifian, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(16) I, Dr. Sharifian, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(b) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;
(c) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 20 Mar 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Babak Sharifian to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 20, 2025:
 
I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
 
I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sharifian engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:
 
Dr. Sharifian will engage in professional education in maintaining an effective vaccine cold chain, complying with Public Health orders, and cooperating with Public Health inspectors.
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 20 Mar 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Babak Sharifian to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 20, 2025:
 
I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
 
I, Dr. Sharifian, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
 
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sharifian engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:
 
Dr. Sharifian will engage in professional education in maintaining an effective vaccine cold chain, complying with Public Health orders, and cooperating with Public Health inspectors.
 

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2014