THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:50:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Spartan Health Sciences University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056262389
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Courteau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Courteau (CPSO#: 103403 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
Room 2CC-101
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
4165306267

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Spartan Health Sciences University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056262389
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Courteau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Courteau (CPSO#: 103403 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
Room 2CC-101
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
4165306267

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIGITTE CHRISTINE COURTEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COURTEAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIGITTE CHRISTINE COURTEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COURTEAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Spartan Health Sciences University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014