THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:26:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa Ontario K8H 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: (613) 687-6808
Address: 76 Grenville Street
Floor 3
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-351-3700
Fax: 416-323-6319

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Aug 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 02 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen Chuang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chuang (CPSO#: 103407 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Floor 3
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa Ontario K8H 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: (613) 687-6808
Address: 76 Grenville Street
Floor 3
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-351-3700
Fax: 416-323-6319

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Aug 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 02 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen Chuang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chuang (CPSO#: 103407 )
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Floor 3
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELEN HAN-RU CHUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELEN HAN-RU CHUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014