THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:40:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 307-50 Acadia Ave
Markham ON L3R 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 479-2524
Fax: (905) 479-2539

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ADAM DMYTRIW MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dmytriw (CPSO#: 103411 )
Business Address: 307-50 Acadia Ave
Markham ON L3R 0B3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 307-50 Acadia Ave
Markham ON L3R 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 479-2524
Fax: (905) 479-2539

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ADAM DMYTRIW MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dmytriw (CPSO#: 103411 )
Business Address: 307-50 Acadia Ave
Markham ON L3R 0B3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM ANDREW DMYTRIW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DMYTRIW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM ANDREW DMYTRIW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DMYTRIW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014