THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:52:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: ESFAM
745 Montreal Rd, Unit 101b
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 749-4429
Fax: 613-749-7942

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne-Marie Auclair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Auclair (CPSO#: 103431 )
Business Address: ESFAM
101B - 745 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
(613) 749-4429

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: ESFAM
745 Montreal Rd, Unit 101b
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 749-4429
Fax: 613-749-7942

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne-Marie Auclair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Auclair (CPSO#: 103431 )
Business Address: ESFAM
101B - 745 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
(613) 749-4429

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE-MARIE AUCLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUCLAIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE-MARIE AUCLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUCLAIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014