THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:04:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Humber River Hospital
Toronto Ontario M3M 3G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Hospital
General Surgery Department
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: 4164952400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Health Network
General Hospital
General Surgery Department
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 4164382911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Noemie-Rose Harvey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Harvey (CPSO#: 103437 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Humber River Hospital
Toronto Ontario M3M 3G8
Business Address: 101 Evans Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6S 3V9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Humber River Hospital
Toronto Ontario M3M 3G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Hospital
General Surgery Department
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: 4164952400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Health Network
General Hospital
General Surgery Department
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 4164382911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Noemie-Rose Harvey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Harvey (CPSO#: 103437 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Humber River Hospital
Toronto Ontario M3M 3G8
Business Address: 101 Evans Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6S 3V9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOEMIE-ROSE HARVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARVEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOEMIE-ROSE HARVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARVEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014