THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:07:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sumac Creek Health Centre
St. Michael's Hospital
73 Regent Park Blvd., 3rd floor
Toronto Ontario M5A 2B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-3022
Fax: 416-864-6051

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sumac Creek Health Centre
St. Michael's Hospital
73 Regent Park Blvd., 3rd floor
Toronto Ontario M5A 2B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-3022
Fax: 416-864-6051

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYLE ON YORK LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYLE ON YORK LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014