THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 08:37:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22 Maple Drive
Orillia Ontario L3V 3W2
Phone: (705) 345-8912
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Wortsman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shemilt (CPSO#: 108308 ) Dr. N. Wortsman (CPSO#: 103443 )
Business Address: 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-6861
Business Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22 Maple Drive
Orillia Ontario L3V 3W2
Phone: (705) 345-8912
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Wortsman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shemilt (CPSO#: 108308 ) Dr. N. Wortsman (CPSO#: 103443 )
Business Address: 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-6861
Business Address: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOAH JONATHON WORTSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WORTSMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOAH JONATHON WORTSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WORTSMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014