THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:21:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1357 Danforth Rd
Scarborough ON M1J 1G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473522295
Fax: 6472608038

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Hadipour Jahromi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jahromi (CPSO#: 103444 )
Business Address: 1357 Danforth Rd
Scarborough ON M1J 1G7
6473522295

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1357 Danforth Rd
Scarborough ON M1J 1G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473522295
Fax: 6472608038

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Hadipour Jahromi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jahromi (CPSO#: 103444 )
Business Address: 1357 Danforth Rd
Scarborough ON M1J 1G7
6473522295

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANA JAHROMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAHROMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANA JAHROMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAHROMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014