THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 03:00:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Holland Crt
Bradford ON L3Z 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-775-8782
Fax: 905-775-9290

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Farhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farhan (CPSO#: 103447 )
Business Address: 200 Holland Crt
Bradford ON L3Z 1R8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Holland Crt
Bradford ON L3Z 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-775-8782
Fax: 905-775-9290

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Farhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farhan (CPSO#: 103447 )
Business Address: 200 Holland Crt
Bradford ON L3Z 1R8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM FARHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM FARHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014