THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 03:45:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-273-0100
Fax: 519-273-0675

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Mazzetti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mazzetti (CPSO#: 103479 )
Business Address: 444 Douro Street
Suite 107
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
(519) 273-0100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-273-0100
Fax: 519-273-0675

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Mazzetti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mazzetti (CPSO#: 103479 )
Business Address: 444 Douro Street
Suite 107
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
(519) 273-0100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM EDWARD MAZZETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZZETTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM EDWARD MAZZETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZZETTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014