THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:10:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 346-1240
Fax: (807) 346-8687

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danielle Eras Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Eras (CPSO#: 103503 )
Business Address: Suite 301
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
(807) 346-1240

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 346-1240
Fax: (807) 346-8687

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danielle Eras Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Eras (CPSO#: 103503 )
Business Address: Suite 301
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7A5
(807) 346-1240

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELLE MARIE ERAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELLE MARIE ERAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014