THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:15:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northern Lung Clinic
Unit 001B - 435 Notre Dame Ave.
Sudbury ON P3C 5K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 805-6859
Fax: (705) 805-0822

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 29 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Addison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Addison (CPSO#: 103506 )
Business Address: 1-435 Notre Dame Ave
Sudbury ON P3C 5K6
7056980714

Corporation Name: C. ADDISON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Dec 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northern Lung Clinic
Unit 001B - 435 Notre Dame Ave.
Sudbury ON P3C 5K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 805-6859
Fax: (705) 805-0822

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 29 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Addison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Addison (CPSO#: 103506 )
Business Address: 1-435 Notre Dame Ave
Sudbury ON P3C 5K6
7056980714

Corporation Name: C. ADDISON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Dec 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CURTIS MICHAEL ALLEN ADDISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADDISON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CURTIS MICHAEL ALLEN ADDISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADDISON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014