THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:21:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Care Group
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B5G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8073462310
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: 7057593434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sara Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kelly (CPSO#: 103513 )
Business Address: 35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
(807) 346-2310

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Care Group
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B5G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8073462310
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: 7057593434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sara Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kelly (CPSO#: 103513 )
Business Address: 35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
(807) 346-2310

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA ANN KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA ANN KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014