THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:58:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 493 Lancaster Street West
Suite 101
Kitchener Ontario N2K 1L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 747-2172
Fax: (519) 571-1174
Address: University of Waterloo
Student Health Services
200 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3G1
Phone: (519)888-4096
Fax: (519)888-4360

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Nartey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nartey (CPSO#: 103538 )
Business Address: 101-493 Lancaster St W
Kitchener ON N2K 1L8
519-747-2172

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 493 Lancaster Street West
Suite 101
Kitchener Ontario N2K 1L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 747-2172
Fax: (519) 571-1174
Address: University of Waterloo
Student Health Services
200 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3G1
Phone: (519)888-4096
Fax: (519)888-4360

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Nartey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nartey (CPSO#: 103538 )
Business Address: 101-493 Lancaster St W
Kitchener ON N2K 1L8
519-747-2172

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL NARTEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARTEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL NARTEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARTEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014