THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:16:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1360 20th St E
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 5N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 664 0072
Fax: 226 664 0193

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rami Abo-Shasha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abo-Shasha (CPSO#: 103544 )
Business Address: 1360 20th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 5N3
226 664 0072

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1360 20th St E
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 5N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 664 0072
Fax: 226 664 0193

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rami Abo-Shasha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abo-Shasha (CPSO#: 103544 )
Business Address: 1360 20th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 5N3
226 664 0072

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMI ABO-SHASHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABO-SHASHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMI ABO-SHASHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABO-SHASHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014