THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:46:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Instituto Tecnologico De Santo Domingo, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 540-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-827-9865
Fax: 905-827-3583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Reynoso Blanco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Reynoso Blanco (CPSO#: 103545 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Instituto Tecnologico De Santo Domingo, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 540-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-827-9865
Fax: 905-827-3583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Reynoso Blanco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Reynoso Blanco (CPSO#: 103545 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHALY ISABEL GREGORIA REYNOSO BLANCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REYNOSO BLANCO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHALY ISABEL GREGORIA REYNOSO BLANCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REYNOSO BLANCO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Instituto Tecnologico De Santo Domingo, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014