THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:46:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 410
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 285-3323
Fax: 416-285-1825

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elah Nadel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Nadel (CPSO#: 103546 )
Business Address: Suite 410
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W2
(416) 285-3323

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 410
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 285-3323
Fax: 416-285-1825

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Sep 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elah Nadel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Nadel (CPSO#: 103546 )
Business Address: Suite 410
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W2
(416) 285-3323

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELAH NADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELAH NADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014