THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:36:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5E1
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kidney Care Clinic
200 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M9N 1N8
Phone: 416-658-2241
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer C. Rodrigues Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rodrigues (CPSO#: 103554 )
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 200 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M9M 1N8
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5E1
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kidney Care Clinic
200 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M9N 1N8
Phone: 416-658-2241
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer C. Rodrigues Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rodrigues (CPSO#: 103554 )
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 200 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M9M 1N8
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER CLAIRE RODRIGUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER CLAIRE RODRIGUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014