THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:48:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Maplewood Ave
North Bay, On
North Bay Ontario P1B 5H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 478-0968
Fax: 705-478-7347

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edie and Gleeson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gleeson (CPSO#: 103561 ) Dr. C. Edie (CPSO#: 103805 )
Business Address: 10 Maplewood Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 5H2
(705) 478-0968
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Maplewood Ave
North Bay, On
North Bay Ontario P1B 5H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 478-0968
Fax: 705-478-7347

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edie and Gleeson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gleeson (CPSO#: 103561 ) Dr. C. Edie (CPSO#: 103805 )
Business Address: 10 Maplewood Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 5H2
(705) 478-0968
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE TERESA GLEESON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLEESON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE TERESA GLEESON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GLEESON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014