THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northern Appointment Clinic
4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout, ON
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 464-1754
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health
Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
Phone: 807-464-1754
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Lorbetskie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lorbetskie (CPSO#: 103564 )
Business Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Box 909
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
(807) 737-3030
Business Address: Dryden Medical Clinic
P.O. Box 3011
40 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z6
(807) 223-6683
Business Address: Dryden Regional Health Centre
58 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z1
(807) 223-8200
Business Address: 4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K8
(807) 737-5182

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northern Appointment Clinic
4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout, ON
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 464-1754
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health
Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
Phone: 807-464-1754
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Lorbetskie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lorbetskie (CPSO#: 103564 )
Business Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Box 909
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
(807) 737-3030
Business Address: Dryden Medical Clinic
P.O. Box 3011
40 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z6
(807) 223-6683
Business Address: Dryden Regional Health Centre
58 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z1
(807) 223-8200
Business Address: 4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1K8
(807) 737-5182

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN PAUL LORBETSKIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORBETSKIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN PAUL LORBETSKIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORBETSKIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014