THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:08:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 723 North St
Mauno Kaihla Koti Nursing Home
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 6G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-945-9987
Fax: 705-945-1217
Address: 46 Gran St
Batchewana First Nation ON P6A 0C6
Phone: 17052558825
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 46 Gran St
InnerBeauty
Batchewana First Nation ON P6A 0C6
Phone: 17052558825
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 650 Northern Ave E
Extendicare Maple View
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 6G3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 264 McNabb St
Inner Beauty Medical Aesthetics
Unit B - Suite 208
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1Y6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-658 Second Line W
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6C 2K9
Phone: 705-450-5339
Extension: na
Fax: 17054505359
Address: 204-765 Queen St E
Midwives of Algoma
Suite 204
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2A8
Phone: 7052534158
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jul 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 18 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. White (CPSO#: 103565 )
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 723 North St
Mauno Kaihla Koti Nursing Home
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 6G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-945-9987
Fax: 705-945-1217
Address: 46 Gran St
Batchewana First Nation ON P6A 0C6
Phone: 17052558825
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 46 Gran St
InnerBeauty
Batchewana First Nation ON P6A 0C6
Phone: 17052558825
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 650 Northern Ave E
Extendicare Maple View
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 6G3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 264 McNabb St
Inner Beauty Medical Aesthetics
Unit B - Suite 208
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1Y6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-658 Second Line W
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6C 2K9
Phone: 705-450-5339
Extension: na
Fax: 17054505359
Address: 204-765 Queen St E
Midwives of Algoma
Suite 204
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2A8
Phone: 7052534158
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jul 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 18 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. White (CPSO#: 103565 )
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH MARIE WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH MARIE WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014