THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:16:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 180
Bothwell ON N0P 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-680-0666
Fax: 226-777-7139

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Garrett B. Mosey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mosey (CPSO#: 103578 )
Business Address: 310 Juliana Dr 5194214211
Business Address: 80 Grand Avenue West
CKHA - Chatham
Chatham Ontario N7L 1B7
Business Address: PO Box 180
Bothwell Ontario N0P 1C0

Corporation Name: Dr. Garrett B. Mosey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 180
Bothwell ON N0P 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-680-0666
Fax: 226-777-7139

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Garrett B. Mosey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mosey (CPSO#: 103578 )
Business Address: 310 Juliana Dr 5194214211
Business Address: 80 Grand Avenue West
CKHA - Chatham
Chatham Ontario N7L 1B7
Business Address: PO Box 180
Bothwell Ontario N0P 1C0

Corporation Name: Dr. Garrett B. Mosey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARRETT BRENT MOSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARRETT BRENT MOSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOSEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014