THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:21:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dox Medical
Unit 5
2683 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 299-0710
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahrose Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Malik (CPSO#: 103581 )
Business Address: 2683 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2S2
(416) 299-0710
Business Address: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 438-2911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dox Medical
Unit 5
2683 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 299-0710
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahrose Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Malik (CPSO#: 103581 )
Business Address: 2683 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2S2
(416) 299-0710
Business Address: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 438-2911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHROSE JAMIL MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHROSE JAMIL MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014