THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:42:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ROBERT LIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lim (CPSO#: 103592 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
613-798-0000
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
613-798-0000
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
613-798-0000
Business Address: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
613-696-7000
Business Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
613-774-2420
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
613-632-1111
Business Address: 499 Raglan St N
Renfrew ON K7V 1P6
613-432-4851
Business Address: 75 Spring St
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
613-256-2500
Business Address: 350 John St N
Arnprior ON K7S 2P6
613-623-3166
Business Address: St. Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay ON K0J 1B0
613-756-3044

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ROBERT LIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lim (CPSO#: 103592 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
613-798-0000
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
613-798-0000
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
613-798-0000
Business Address: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
613-696-7000
Business Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester ON K0C 2K0
613-774-2420
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
613-632-1111
Business Address: 499 Raglan St N
Renfrew ON K7V 1P6
613-432-4851
Business Address: 75 Spring St
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
613-256-2500
Business Address: 350 John St N
Arnprior ON K7S 2P6
613-623-3166
Business Address: St. Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay ON K0J 1B0
613-756-3044

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT SEUNG HEUN LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT SEUNG HEUN LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014