THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:13:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 195 Henry Street
Unit 5
Brantford Ontario N3S 5C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 752 9999
Fax: 519 752 7992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adeela Arooj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Arooj (CPSO#: 103598 )
Business Address: 195 Henry street-Unit 5
Brantford Ontario N3C 5C9
5197529999
Business Address: 40 Shellington Place
Suite 204
Brantford Ontario N3C 0C5
(519) 759-6116
Business Address: 50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4W3
(905) 529-4040

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 195 Henry Street
Unit 5
Brantford Ontario N3S 5C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 752 9999
Fax: 519 752 7992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adeela Arooj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Arooj (CPSO#: 103598 )
Business Address: 195 Henry street-Unit 5
Brantford Ontario N3C 5C9
5197529999
Business Address: 40 Shellington Place
Suite 204
Brantford Ontario N3C 0C5
(519) 759-6116
Business Address: 50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4W3
(905) 529-4040

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEELA AROOJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AROOJ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEELA AROOJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AROOJ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014