THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:56:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Georgetown University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
Sunnyside West Suite 223
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165306563
Fax: 6476702255
Address: M002-55 University Ave
Push Pounds Studio Athletica
Toronto ON M5J 2H7
Phone: 416-722-3393
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joyce Man-Wan Fu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fu (CPSO#: 103599 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Suite 223 West
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
4165306563

Corporation Name: Joyce Man-Wan Fu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Mar 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Georgetown University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
Sunnyside West Suite 223
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165306563
Fax: 6476702255
Address: M002-55 University Ave
Push Pounds Studio Athletica
Toronto ON M5J 2H7
Phone: 416-722-3393
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joyce Man-Wan Fu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fu (CPSO#: 103599 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Suite 223 West
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
4165306563

Corporation Name: Joyce Man-Wan Fu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Mar 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOYCE MAN-WAN FU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOYCE MAN-WAN FU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Georgetown University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014