THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:03:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 316-4789 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 351-6501
Fax: (647) 797-0224
Address: 305-20 Wynford Dr
North York ON M3C 1J4
Phone: 416-441-1313
Fax: 416-441-6138
Address: 245 Danforth Avenue
Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 462-0393
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. VICTORIA C. LEUNG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Leung (CPSO#: 103609 )
Business Address: 4789 Yonge St
Suite 316
North York ON M2N 0G3
(647) 351-6501
Business Address: Wynford Drive
Toronto Ontario M3C
Business Address: 20 Wynford Drive
Suite 305
Toronto Ontario M3C 1J4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 316-4789 Yonge St
North York ON M2N 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 351-6501
Fax: (647) 797-0224
Address: 305-20 Wynford Dr
North York ON M3C 1J4
Phone: 416-441-1313
Fax: 416-441-6138
Address: 245 Danforth Avenue
Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 462-0393
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. VICTORIA C. LEUNG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Leung (CPSO#: 103609 )
Business Address: 4789 Yonge St
Suite 316
North York ON M2N 0G3
(647) 351-6501
Business Address: Wynford Drive
Toronto Ontario M3C
Business Address: 20 Wynford Drive
Suite 305
Toronto Ontario M3C 1J4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA CHRISTINE WAI-KEI LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA CHRISTINE WAI-KEI LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014