THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:09:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 134
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 946-0284
Fax: (519) 946-0285

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Margarette Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Youssef (CPSO#: 103614 )
Business Address: 134 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 946-0248

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 134
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 946-0284
Fax: (519) 946-0285

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Margarette Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Youssef (CPSO#: 103614 )
Business Address: 134 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 946-0248

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARETTE YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARETTE YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014