THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:21:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
15 Elizabeth Street East
Creemore Ontario L0M 1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-466-3077
Fax: 705-466-2587

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yixin Xie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Xie (CPSO#: 103615 )
Business Address: 1-15 Elizabeth St E
Creemore ON L0M 1G0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1
15 Elizabeth Street East
Creemore Ontario L0M 1G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-466-3077
Fax: 705-466-2587

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yixin Xie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Xie (CPSO#: 103615 )
Business Address: 1-15 Elizabeth St E
Creemore ON L0M 1G0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIXIN XIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIXIN XIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014