THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:06:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Rehab Bickle
130 Dunn Ave
Toronto Ontario M6K 2R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Extension: 2235
Fax: (416) 588-4174

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E LING MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ling (CPSO#: 103624 )
Business Address: 130 Dunn Ave
Toronto ON M6K 2R7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Rehab Bickle
130 Dunn Ave
Toronto Ontario M6K 2R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Extension: 2235
Fax: (416) 588-4174

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E LING MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ling (CPSO#: 103624 )
Business Address: 130 Dunn Ave
Toronto ON M6K 2R7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERICK KAMING LING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERICK KAMING LING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014