THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:22:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 883 Mulock Drive
North GTA Medical
Unit 5
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052352620
Fax: 905-235-3942
Address: 20798 Dalton Rd
Sutton West ON L0E 1R0
Phone: +1 800-361-5653
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lindsay Anne McColl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. McColl (CPSO#: 103639 )
Business Address: 5-883 Mulock Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 8S3
905-235-3825
Business Address: 885 Prete Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3X9
(705) 586-3601

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 883 Mulock Drive
North GTA Medical
Unit 5
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052352620
Fax: 905-235-3942
Address: 20798 Dalton Rd
Sutton West ON L0E 1R0
Phone: +1 800-361-5653
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lindsay Anne McColl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. McColl (CPSO#: 103639 )
Business Address: 5-883 Mulock Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 8S3
905-235-3825
Business Address: 885 Prete Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3X9
(705) 586-3601

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDSAY ANNE MCCOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCOLL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDSAY ANNE MCCOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCOLL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014