THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:23:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3333 Brimley Road
Toronto Ontario M1V 2J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-412-3333
Fax: 416-412-6200
Address: 96-550 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3Z4
Phone: 905-707-8181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rick Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chen (CPSO#: 103642 )
Business Address: 96-550 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3Z4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3333 Brimley Road
Toronto Ontario M1V 2J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-412-3333
Fax: 416-412-6200
Address: 96-550 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3Z4
Phone: 905-707-8181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rick Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chen (CPSO#: 103642 )
Business Address: 96-550 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3Z4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICK CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICK CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014