THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:30:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Rosario, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 209- 481 London Road
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-336-1788
Fax: 519-336-6150

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steimbrecher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Steimbrecher (CPSO#: 103645 )
Business Address: 481 London Rd
Unit 209
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3
519-336-1788
Business Address: 481 London Road
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
(519) 336-1788
Business Address: 481 London Rd
Unit 209
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: National University of Rosario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 209- 481 London Road
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-336-1788
Fax: 519-336-6150

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steimbrecher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Steimbrecher (CPSO#: 103645 )
Business Address: 481 London Rd
Unit 209
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3
519-336-1788
Business Address: 481 London Road
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
(519) 336-1788
Business Address: 481 London Rd
Unit 209
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA FERNANDA STEIMBRECHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIMBRECHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA FERNANDA STEIMBRECHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIMBRECHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Rosario, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014