THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:21:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 1841
Fax: (905) 813-4024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ESTHER LAU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lau (CPSO#: 103654 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Trillium Health Partners Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 1841
Fax: (905) 813-4024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ESTHER LAU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lau (CPSO#: 103654 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Trillium Health Partners Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YEE TAK ESTHER LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YEE TAK ESTHER LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Sep 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014