THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:06:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Community
Health Centres
363 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)-754-0777
Fax: 519-754-0757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew C. Kennedy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kennedy (CPSO#: 103655 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
519-752-7871
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario M3R 1G9
(519) 752-7871
Business Address: 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario M7M 5L9
(519) 352-6400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Community
Health Centres
363 Colborne Street
Brantford Ontario N3S 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)-754-0777
Fax: 519-754-0757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 04 Nov 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew C. Kennedy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kennedy (CPSO#: 103655 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
519-752-7871
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario M3R 1G9
(519) 752-7871
Business Address: 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario M7M 5L9
(519) 352-6400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW COLIN KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW COLIN KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014