THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:18:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Tassone Medince Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tassone (CPSO#: 103676 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9802

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Tassone Medince Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tassone (CPSO#: 103676 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9802

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS TASSONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TASSONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS TASSONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TASSONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014