THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:06:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Ave
3rd Floor
St. Catharines Ontario L2S0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053784647
Extension: 46412
Fax: 9056846411

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Maddison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maddison (CPSO#: 103680 )
Business Address: St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
3rd Floor
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647 Extn: 46412

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Ave
3rd Floor
St. Catharines Ontario L2S0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053784647
Extension: 46412
Fax: 9056846411

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Maddison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maddison (CPSO#: 103680 )
Business Address: St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
3rd Floor
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647 Extn: 46412

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE RALPH MADDISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADDISON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE RALPH MADDISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADDISON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014