THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:10:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Summerville Family Health Team
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 211
Etobicoke Ontario M9C5N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)621-9700
Fax: (416)621-4438

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carlo Cifelli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cifelli (CPSO#: 103706 )
Business Address: Summerville Family Health Team
Suite 211
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
(416) 621-9700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Summerville Family Health Team
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 211
Etobicoke Ontario M9C5N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)621-9700
Fax: (416)621-4438

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carlo Cifelli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cifelli (CPSO#: 103706 )
Business Address: Summerville Family Health Team
Suite 211
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
(416) 621-9700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLO CIFELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIFELLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLO CIFELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIFELLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014