THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:17:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306-984 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8073454337
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon Sun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sun (CPSO#: 103712 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306-984 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8073454337
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 17 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon Sun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sun (CPSO#: 103712 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMON XIAO YI SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIMON XIAO YI SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014